DE HB380 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
According to a survey conducted by the American Bar Association, 90 percent of early-career lawyers have student loans, averaging $130,000. The same survey found that Black borrowers accumulated more debt to obtain their law degree compared to other borrowers of other racial/ethnic backgrounds, and that most young lawyers who borrowed for their education reported that their debt caused them to delay or forego pursuing traditional life milestones, such as purchasing a home, marriage, and starting a family. According to the survey, an overwhelming majority of borrowers roughly 80 percent indicated their debt influenced their choice of job or career in some way. Most borrowers reported that salary factored more heavily into their job selection than anticipated. Nearly a third of the sample indicated their position was less focused on public service or doing good than intended when they started law school.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Public Attorney Student Loan Repayment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-22 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 9 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 380 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 380 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-04-07 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-04-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable | |
2022-03-31 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |