DE HB38 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act establishes in-person early voting in Delaware beginning January 1, 2022. Registered voters will be allowed to vote in-person during at least 10 days before an election, up to and including the Saturday and Sunday immediately before the election at locations determined by the State Election Commissioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Early Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO
2019-03-27 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-03-19 Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2019-03-19 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
2019-03-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-03-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-03-13 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits
2019-01-16 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback