DE HB378 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires health spas selling subscription services online to provide a prospective buyer of such a subscription the right to cancel the automatic renewal online. The option to cancel is also to be presented on the website in a clear and conspicuous manner to simplify such cancellation for the buyer.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Spa Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 378 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate | |
2024-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-04-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |