DE HB375 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill moves the date of primary elections for statewide office, county office, and municipal office to the fourth Tuesday in April, which is the date of the presidential primary. The dates for submitting and withdrawing a notification of candidacy have similarly been adjusted. The bill takes effect in 2020.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Primary Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2016-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 2 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-08 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-05-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |