DE HB368 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Green Alert Program to aid in locating missing members of the armed forces, including veterans, who have a physical or mental health condition that is related to their service. This Act is modeled after Delawares existing Gold Alert and Blue Alert Programs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Green Alert Program For Certain Missing Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-09 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 368 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 368 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 1 Favorable, 15 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-17 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House | |
2018-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |