DE HB363 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In the 147th General Assembly, the state employee pension law was amended to permit corrections officers employed in positions that are classified as Hazardous Duty Level A-1 to retire at 25 years without any reduction. Those employees will pay a higher employee contribution rate. Those employees that continue to work past 25 years of service will have the multiplier used in the calculation of benefits increased for the years past 25 years. This bill extends the same treatment to other corrections and enforcement officers. These officers are probation and parole officers in the Department of Corrections, Capitol Police officers, DNREC police officers, University of Delaware police, and officers working for the State Fire Marshal. There is a two-year delay between the effective date of the increased contribution and the implementation of the new benefit calculation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2016-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |