DE HB361 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act removes § 617 Criminal Youth Gangs from the list of felonies designated as violent felonies and adds § 616 Gang Participation so that age is less of a factor in determining whether a violent felony was committed. In addition, this Act makes § 1103A Child Abuse in the Second Degree a violent felony. Further, this Act makes technical corrections by updating the violent felonies list to reflect § 1103B Child Abuse in the First Degree, which was formerly known as § 615 Assault by Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Violent Felonies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-03-29 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback