DE HB360 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Act, which shall be known as the 2022 Delaware Relief Rebate Program, creates a relief rebate which is a one-time direct payment of $300 per Delaware resident taxpayer. This relief is intended to help Delawareans grappling with significant inflation at the grocery store and gas pump.
Title
An Act To Create The 2022 Delaware Relief Rebate Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-04-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-13 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-07 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2022-04-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2022-04-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 360 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-04-07 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2022-04-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 360 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-04-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2022-04-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |