DE HB356 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
On military installations subject to exclusive federal jurisdiction, the investigation and prosecution of juveniles for alleged violation of federal crimes is conducted in the federal court system. The federal court system often tries juveniles as adults and it lacks juvenile-focused resources. Federal law, however, permits the State to accept concurrent jurisdiction over juvenile matters on military installations if a request is made by a United States official and the Governor, via Executive Order, accepts the request.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Concurrent Jurisdiction Of Juveniles Who Commit Crimes On United States Military Installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2024-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-07 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 356, and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |