DE HB356 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to lease historic structures on State public lands to individuals or corporate entities. The lessee would be required to renovate and maintain the structure up to the applicable National Park Service Secretary of Interior Standards, would be permitted to insure the property and are eligible for Land and Historic Resource Tax Credits. DNREC is required adopt any necessary rules and regulations to implement the Act and may require the lessee to abide by any other lease conditions or commitments, including specific expenditure requirements, which the DNREC deems advisable for the public good.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conservation.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Timothy Dukes [R] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-10 | Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |