DE HB348 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides nationally certified occupational therapists with a salary supplement for receiving national certification. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing language to the standards of the Delaware Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Basic Salary Schedule For School-based Physical And Occupational Therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-22 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-07 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-04-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |