DE HB335 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the Delaware School Safety and Security Fund to allow certain eligible public schools to partially or fully fund projects intended to improve school facilities and training relating to safety or security. The Department of Education shall administer the fund. This Act is effective upon appropriation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Establishing A School Safety And Security Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-21 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-21 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-14 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 335 |