DE HB334 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill permits health-care providers who are licensed in a state other than Delaware to deliver health-care services by telehealth and telemedicine only if a health-care provider-patient relationship has been established in accordance with ยง 6003 of Title 24.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Relating To Practice By Telehealth And Telemedicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-28 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 334 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 334 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |
2022-05-19 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 334 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 334 - Stricken in House | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 334 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-05-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 334 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |