DE HB333 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The Delaware Gaming Competitiveness Act of 2012 improves the ability of the Delaware Lottery and Delaware's video lottery agents to offer services to lottery players in an increasingly competitive marketplace. The Act authorizes internet gaming under the control and operation of the Delaware Lottery. The Delaware Lottery Office is authorized to conduct traditional lottery games over the internet. Delaware's video lottery agents are authorized to offer through their websites internet versions of the table games and video lottery offerings. All games shall remain operated by the Delaware Lottery. These offerings capitalize on a recent United States Department of Justice ruling clarifying that wagering within a state's boundaries does not violate federal law. The Act requires the Lottery Director to provide for the security and effective administration of internet gaming, including procedures for verifying the location and identify of players, mechanisms for maintaining account security, procedures to exclude minors or other excluded persons, limits on the amount which can be wagered, and advertisements for services for compulsive gamblers. Internet lottery games would be offered solely to persons within the State of Delaware at the current time. A person's location would be determined from a person's computer or mobile device. This territorial limitation applies to all gaming except gaming pursuant to an interstate compact or if otherwise legally authorized. Internet lottery participation would be limited to persons who meet the age requirements for equivalent non-internet games. Revenues from the internet lottery would be distributed in a manner similar to current lottery games. The internet versions of table games and video lottery games would be distributed generally pursuant to the formulae applicable to those games, with the exception that the first $3.75 million would be retained by the Lottery to ensure the proposal is at least revenue neutral to the State. As such, revenues from those games would support services for compulsive gambling and additional purse revenue for thoroughbred and standardbred racing. The Act compels the Department of Finance to conduct a study of purse revenue generally for submission to the Governor and General Assembly on or before January 30, 2013. The Department of Finance would also prepare a report for consideration by the General Assembly on or before January 30, 2016 for reevaluation of the purses generated by internet table games. The Act also restructures the fees currently paid by video lottery agents to incentivize those agents to reinvest up to $7.75 million in their improved competitiveness through capital investments and marketing plans. The Act also amends Title 4 to provide that restaurants who participate as lottery agents do not have the receipts from lottery activities counted as part of the receipts not generated by food service. The Act further authorizes the Delaware Lottery to operate the sports lottery at venues other than the video lottery agents, such as bars or convenience stores. The Lottery would prioritize applications to operate the sports lottery for those proposals most likely to foster economic growth and job creation. It also authorizes the Delaware Lottery to operate keno, a numbers game in which players select numbers and winners are chosen at regular intervals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 4 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Lottery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-28 Signed by Governor
2012-06-27 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-27 Amendment SA 2 - Stricken
2012-06-27 Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 14 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-27 Amendment SA 1 defeated
2012-06-26 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2012-06-21 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2012-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2012-06-13 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2012-06-12 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 29 YES 8 NO 4 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 3 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 3 defeated
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Introduced in House
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 1 defeated
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2012-06-12 Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2012-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (GAMING & PARIMUTUELS) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2012-05-09 Introduced and Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback