DE HB332 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds misdemeanor possession and paraphernalia marijuana offenses to the list of violations and offenses for which a person may be eligible for probation before judgment if the person otherwise qualifies for probation before judgment. This bill also removes the prohibition for using probation before judgment with the first offenders controlled substances diversion program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Probation Before Judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2016-06-07 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |