DE HB331 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates regulations concerning the use, distribution and education of Benzodiazepine and Non-benzodiazepine Hypnotics. It require Practitioners to obtain consent from a minors parent or guardian prior to prescribing these drugs, and require pharmacist to include a cautionary statement explaining the risks associated with the long term use of these drugs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Benzodiazepine And Non-benzodiazepine Hypnotics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-04-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 331 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-18 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 331 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |