DE HB330 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Amendment SA 5 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This bill changes the age of a person to whom another person can sell, give or transfer a firearm or ammunition for a firearm from 18 to 21. However, this bill permits a person to sell, give or transfer a firearm or ammunition for a firearm to a person under 21 years of age if the person under 21 is an active member of the United States Armed Forces or a law-enforcement officer or possesses a license to carry a concealed deadly weapon. The prohibition against the sale or transfer of a firearm to a person under 21 does not apply if that person is over 18 and the firearm is a shotgun or muzzle-loading rifle or if the ammunition is for such weapons. This bill does permit the transfer of a firearm or ammunition to a person under 21 so long as such transfer is without compensation and the person transferring is the parent or guardian of the person under 21 or has the permission of the parent or guardian. This bill increases the age from 18-21 for the person who must directly supervise a child under the age of 16 who is in possession of a firearm, BB, air, or spear gun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Amendment SA 5 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-29 Amendment SA 4 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-29 Amendment SA 3 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-29 Amendment SA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-29 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-03-29 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Laid On Table in Senate
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-03-20 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-20 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-03-20 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-20 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-16 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-13 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 330, and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback