DE HB330 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
All Notices of Intent issued by the Division of Child Support Enforcement are sent regular mail except for the insurance lien notices. This Act removes the requirement that notice to non-custodial parents for insurance settlement liens taken for child support arrears be sent by certified mail and, instead, substitutes notification to the non-custodial parent via regular first-class mail. This legislation will allow for this section of code to become uniform and reflect more recent administrative enforcement notice requirements such as State and Federal Tax Refund Intercept, Notice of Income Withholding, Passport Denial, Lottery Offset, and Credit Bureau Reporting.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Support Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Timothy Dukes [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |