DE HB328 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes several adjustments to the law prohibiting drag racing and other speed contests. Many individuals lawfully gather to share their enthusiasm for vehicles and may do so while abiding the rules of the road and without otherwise endangering persons or property. However, others have taken their enthusiasm into dangerous directions that often results in damage to property, injury, or death. For example, Kirkwood Highway has experienced an uptick in large crowds engaged in dangerous driving behavior and as the result of a drag racing event at the Christiana Mall Fashion Center, there was a vehicular fatality. Whether by drag racing, trick or stunt riding, conducting burnouts in intersections, doing donuts in parking lots, or taking over roadways to showboat, these dangers are further amplified by the crowd size that follows and the attempted notoriety sought through social media posts.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 And Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drag Racing And Other Dangerous Operations Of Motorized Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-22 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-03-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 328 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-03-22 | Vote type changed from Simple Majority (SM) to 2/3 Majority by amendment | |
2022-03-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 328 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |