DE HB328 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes it a crime to fly an unmanned aircraft system to do any of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unmanned Aircraft Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Sen. Colin Bonini [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-20 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |