DE HB328 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes it a crime to fly an unmanned aircraft system to do any of the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unmanned Aircraft Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12 Signed by Governor
2018-04-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-20 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2018-03-20 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback