DE HB318 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act doubles the research and development tax credit available to smaller businesses while keeping in place the annual cap of $5 million for the credit as a whole. Currently, all businesses are entitled to a state tax credit that is equal to half of the corresponding federal tax credit for R&D activity occurring in Delaware. Under this Act, businesses with less than $20 million average annual gross receipts for the most recent four years are entitled to a credit equal to 100% of the corresponding federal credit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Research And Development Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SMALL BUSINESS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Small Business Committee in Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |