DE HB314 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides for a clear and established procedure and time frame during which public employees may revoke their membership in an employee organization. This Act allows public employers and employee organizations to manage membership status and authorizations in a manner that will meet public employees desires while not disrupting the public employers or employee organizations operations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Public Employment Relations Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |