DE HB311 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The Board of Clinical Social Work Examiners (Board) has worked several years to amend Chapter 39, Title 24 of the Delaware Code to update the statute governing social work licensure and practice in this State. The Boards work has included collaboration with the Division of Professional Regulation, the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee, several state agencies, and other stakeholders. The result of that work is this Act, which modernizes Chapter 39 to include a multi-tiered licensure system similar to those already in place in most other states, reflect current practices and standards, and clarify the law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Clinical Social Work Examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2018-04-17 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 311 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 311 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-25 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback