DE HB310 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The United States Space Force was established on December 20, 2019 as part of the National Defense Authorization Act. The Space Force became the 6th branch of the United States Armed Forces. This Act inserts the Space Force in those sections of the Delaware Code where the other 5 branches of the armed forces are specifically enumerated This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6, 14, And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The United States Space Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2024-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 16 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-01-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |