DE HB302 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Substitute Act incorporates House Bill No. 302, and also makes the following changes to House Bill No. 302:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Individuals With Mental Illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30 Signed by Governor
2018-04-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-27 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 4 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-06 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 302, and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback