DE HB30 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides State funding to kindergarten through third grade for basic special education. State funding already occurs for intensive and complex special education during these grades. Currently the basic special education funding runs from fourth through twelfth grade. This bill is an effort to promote earlier identification and assistance for basic special education needs which should then mitigate costs over the long term.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-03-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 13 On Its Merits |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |