DE HB30 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the Voluntary School Assessment fee paid by developers to more accurately reflect current school construction costs. In addition, the bill raises the cap on the Voluntary School Assessment to 6 percent of the total cost of a residential unit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Powers, Duties And Functions Of The Secretary Of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Cathcart [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] |
Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2010-01-14 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 13 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |