DE HB295 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act fills a gap regarding the definition of “residence” in Delaware’s Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act (“SORNA”) that was recently identified by the decision of the Delaware Supreme Court in Andrews v. State. 34 A.3d 1061, 1064 (Del. 2011). Unlike many other jurisdictions, Delaware’s SORNA does not specifically define what would be considered a “residence” that must be registered. As the purpose of the Delaware’s SORNA is to ensure that persons are registered where they actually live or are located, this Act ensures that one must register each such location.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Relating To The Registration Of Sex Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-27 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-16 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-25 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |