DE HB285 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 6 NO 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill requires all public and charter schools which have students in grades 6-12 to provide free feminine hygiene products in 50% of the bathrooms used by students who can have a menstrual cycle. This bill also requires schools to publish on its website and post in its common areas the locations of the bathrooms where the hygiene products are provided. Finally, this bill provides that each school must consult with its school nurse regarding the products to be provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Provision Of Free Feminine Hygiene Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 6 NO 2 ABSENT
2020-01-28 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-28 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-15 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback