DE HB285 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill corrects technical errors to House Bill 177, passed in 2011 and dealing with juvenile expungement. Section 1 addresses confusion which has arisen regarding whether a Family Court judge may order expungement of charges arising in other counties. Sections 2, 3 and 4 address an accidental overlap in definitions of sex offenses in House Bill 177. The correction eliminates the overlap between misdemeanor and felony sex offenses and clarifies that a five-year wait applies before application may be made for discretionary expungement of a felony sex offense. Section 5 eliminates the requirement that the expungement order be sent by the Family Court to the federal Department of Justice. This communication is already handled by the State Police and the federal government will not accept the communication from the Courts.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-25 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |