DE HB276 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds a mandatory $500 penalty to criminal and/or civil charges of injuring, damaging, littering, or applying graffiti to or along a scenic and historical highway or a scenic byway, as defined in 17 Del.C. 101(a)(9), as follows: 101(a)(9) A “Scenic and Historic Highway” or “Scenic Byway” is a transportation route which is adjacent to or runs along or next to an area that has particular intrinsic scenic, historic, recreational, cultural or archaeology qualities for which such transportation route is managed in order to protect such characteristics and to encourage development of tourism and recreational resources.”
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 11, 16, 17 And 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Criminal Mischief, Graffiti, And Other Injury To A Scenic And Historical Highway Or A Scenic Byway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2010-01-14 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-01-13 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |