DE HB274 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act repeals the requirement that individuals seeking to change their name publish notice of the petition for change of name in a newspaper published in the county in which the proceeding is had at least once a week for 3 weeks before the petition is filed. This provision does not exist in 20 other states, including our neighbors in New Jersey, Maryland, and Virginia, and serves to only add an additional financial barrier to those seeking to change their name.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Change Of Name.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-27 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2022-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-01-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |