DE HB271 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Department of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families (DSCYF) is charged with providing transitional and independent living services for youth ages 14 to 21. The Division of Family Services (DFS) contracts for case management services for youth ages 16 to 21, with services designed to promote self-sufficiency and responsible living for young adults who are aging out of foster care. Participants receive life skills training and personal development, mentoring, tuition assistance, and support with transitional housing. Participants may also qualify to receive needs-based stipends through ASSIST (Achieving Self Sufficiency & Independence through Supported Transition) to help with living expenses. DFS recently changed the name of the Independent Living Program to the Transitional and Independent Living Program to better reflect the comprehensive nature of services offered to youth. This bill updates references to the program to include transitional and independent living services.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 13 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Independent Living Services For Young Adults Aging Out Of Foster Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-09 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-27 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2022-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 3 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2022-01-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-13 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-01-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |