DE HB265 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is based on New York’s oral parity law, which requires insurance companies to make equal reimbursement for oral and intravenous anticancer medications. Section 1 applies to individual health insurance policies. Section 2 applies to group or blanket policies. The coverage provisions of Sections 1 and 2 are identical. The bill applies to health insurance policies issued, renewed, or amended on or after January 1, 2013. This act is “The Delaware Cancer Treatment Access Act.”
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance Coverage For Oral And Intravenous Anticancer Medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |