DE HB263 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that individual, group, and State employee insurance plans cap the amount an individual must pay for insulin prescriptions at $100 a month and must include at least 1 formulation of insulin on the lowest tier of the drug formulary developed and maintained by the carrier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cost Sharing In Prescription Insulin Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-30 Amendment HA 2 to HB 263 - Stricken in House
2020-01-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 263 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 263 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 263 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-09 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback