DE HB262 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Banking, Business & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act seeks to provide consumers with critical information about how their personal information is being used by data brokers. This Act requires data brokers to register with the Consumer Protection Unit of the Department of Justice and answer questions regarding their use of personal information that would be published online to inform consumers. A fee schedule is established based on the size of the data broker that would fund the enforcement of the statute. Entities or individuals who collect personal information but do not sell or license that personal data are not required to register. Registration only applies to data brokers who sell or license information. The Act prohibits acquiring or providing brokered personal information where it will be used for certain unlawful purposes, or where it was obtained through fraudulent means. The Act requires data brokers to protect brokered personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Data Brokers And Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2022-05-05 Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT
2022-05-05 Amendment HA 2 to HB 262 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2022-05-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 262 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2022-05-04 Amendment HA 2 to HB 262 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2022-04-13 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2022-03-31 Amendment HA 1 to HB 262 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2022-01-27 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2022-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (Technology & Telecommunications) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2022-01-13 Assigned to Technology & Telecommunications Committee in House
2021-06-30 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback