DE HB249 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

An estimated 100,000 people in Delaware participate in some form of fantasy sports, whether it is a football or baseball league with their friends and family, or more recently, a daily or weekly contest against players from across the country. This legislation confirms that those contests are "games of skill" and, therefore, not a form of illegal gambling under Delaware law. It also requires operators to apply for a license and comply with some of the strictest consumer protection safeguards in the nation. Finally, the legislation subjects operators of paid fantasy sports contests to a 15% tax on their net adjusted revenues, as well as a $50,000 annual fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Interactive Fantasy Contests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-30 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2017-06-30 Reconsidered in Senate
2017-06-29 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 11 NO
2017-06-29 Amendment SA 1 to HB 249 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 6 NO 2 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 2 to HB 249 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 249 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 249 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback