DE HB232 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act would both raise the jurisdictional limit of the Justice of the Peace Court to $25,000 and allow Justice of the Peace to consider claims in excess of the jurisdictional limit where the underlying matter involves a commercial tenancy and possession of the rental unit is at issue. Currently, if a party is owed rent in excess of the jurisdictional limit they must either submit to the jurisdictional limit of the Court and forego the portion of the claim which exceeds the jurisdictional limit or bifurcate the case, filing both for possession in the Justice of the Peace Court and a debt action in a court of competent jurisdiction. While this Act would increase efficiency in terms of allowing one court to consider all aspects of the case it would in no way preclude a party from bifurcating the action if they chose to do so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 And Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Jurisdiction Of The Justice Of The Peace Court And Summary Possession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-25 Signed by Governor
2020-06-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-23 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-21 Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
2019-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2019-06-17 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback