DE HB225 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill establishes the State Council for Adult Offender Supervision as required by the Interstate Compact for the Supervision of Adult Offenders, codified at 11 Del. C. 4358. The State Council’s role is to administer the State of Delaware’s participation in the Compact and ensure that the State remains a productive member of the Compact.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Interstate Compact For The Supervision Of Adult Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 6 Favorable | |
2009-06-11 | Introduced in House and assigned to Corrections Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |