DE HB222 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Currently, blood lead level screening and testing rates are well below what the Division of Public Health would expect them to be based on the risk factors that determine when screening or testing is necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Childhood Lead Poisoning Prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Signed by Governor
2021-06-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-22 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-06-17 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2021-06-17 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 222 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 222 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2021-06-03 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback