DE HB22 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the format in which abandoned personal property is defined to make it simpler to read and adds a provision that the language used in the forms of applications, notices and declarations should be simple and non-technical. Additionally, this Bill provides the owner or person claiming an interest in the property the ability to file a replevin counterclaim, in addition to defending the abandoned property claim, prior to the final determination of title by the Court. Finally, this Bill amends the notice requirement for a sale from 30 days to 15 days and requires publication of the sale in 5 public places, making the notification requires consistent with actions of a similar nature, such as garagekeeper’s liens.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Abandoned Property
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. George [?] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Harvey Kenton [R] | Sen. Robert Venables [D] | Rep. Rebecca Walker [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-03-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |