DE HB214 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act supports veterinarians in their effort to protect people from rabies and to ensure the welfare of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 3 And 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rabies And Other Vaccination Requirements, And Licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23 Signed by Governor
2020-01-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-12-19 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2019-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-30 Amendment HA 2 to HB 214 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 214 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-24 Amendment HA 2 to HB 214 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2019-06-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 214 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-12 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback