DE HB212 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill defines industrial landfill in conformity with the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Controls Regulations Governing Solid Waste. This bill also establishes a height restriction, or vertical limit, for an industrial landfill at 130 feet above the mean sea level of the area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Environmental Control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-01-30 Amendment SA 3 to HB 212 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-01-30 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2020-01-30 Reconsidered in Senate
2020-01-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-29 Amendment SA 2 to HB 212 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-28 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 5 to HB 212 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 1 to HA 5 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 4 to HB 212 - Stricken in House
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 4 to HB 212 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-16 Amendment SA 1 to HB 212 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2019-12-19 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2019-06-25 Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 14 NO 2 ABSENT
2019-06-25 Amendment HA 3 to HB 212 - Stricken in House
2019-06-25 Amendment HA 2 to HB 212 - Stricken in House
2019-06-25 Amendment HA 1 to HB 212 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-25 Amendment HA 1 to HB 212 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.delaware.gov/BillDetail?LegislationId=47666
Texthttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/BillDetail/GenerateHtmlDocument?legislationId=47666&legislationTypeId=1&docTypeId=2&legislationName=HB212
Texthttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/BillDetail/GenerateHtmlDocumentEngrossment?engrossmentId=23776&docTypeId=6
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41067
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41351
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41412
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41432
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41447
Roll Callhttp://legis.delaware.gov/json/RollCall/GetRollCallVoteByRollCallId#41453

Bill Comments

feedback