DE HB21 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act takes steps to ensure that individuals with disabilities are not denied access to organ transplant procedures based solely on their disability. Historically, individuals with disabilities have sometimes been denied access to life-saving organ transplants based on assumptions that people with disabilities are less worthy of care, or assumptions that the lack support services and/or the ability to follow post-transplant treatment plans. This bill prohibits denying a person with a disability a referral, evaluation and recommendation for transplantation solely on the basis of a non-medically significant disability and notes that persons who have the necessary support system to comply with post-transplant medical requirements should not have the inability to independently comply with those requirements held against them. The Act does not require referrals, recommendations or performance of medically inappropriate organ transplants. It affirms the state's commitment to the elimination of discrimination on the basis of disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nondiscrimination In Access To Organ Transplantation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 21 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 21 - Stricken in House
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 21 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 21 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2017-01-05 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback