DE HB206 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue a conditional license at the request of the Justice of the Peace for a Driving Under the Influence offender whose charge is still pending, but whose license has been suspended by the Division of Motor Vehicles. The conditional license can only be issued on the condition that the offender submit to continuous sobriety monitoring. This Act ensures that a person can enter a sobriety monitoring program, but not face the loss of full licensure that would negate the benefits of entering and participating in such a program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drivers License Revocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-07-01 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2017-07-01 Reconsidered in Senate
2017-06-29 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 5 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback