DE HB196 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act would give sole responsibility for voter list maintenance to the Departments of Elections in the counties, permit persons whose business or occupation is providing care to a parent, spouse or child requiring constant care due to illness, injury or disability to self-administer the affidavit for an absentee ballot, expand the validity of Federal Post Card Applications, and permits voters who are sick or physically disabled to be sent and to return absentee ballots by electronic transmission. This act would also require recipients of State funding to make facilities available for polling, so long as it would not be incompatible with the recipient’s primary purpose.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Voters And To Polling Places.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-06-21 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-16 | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken | |
2012-05-16 | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2011-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |