DE HB195 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Chapter 11 of Title 16 was enacted in 1998. Since that time, there have been many changes to the health care delivery system, including a larger percentage of individuals receiving long term health care services in their homes and settings other than in traditional nursing facilities. This Act updates Chapter 11 of Title 16 to better protect residents of long term care facilities by using consistent terminology, consistent practices, and updating the Code to reflect changes in related areas of the law and in how long term care is provided to ensure that all Delawareans receiving long term care are protected from abuse, neglect, and financial exploitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating Nursing Facilities, Long Term Care Facilities, And Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 195 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 195 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback