DE HB193 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Delaware Health Insurance Individual Market Stabilization Reinsurance Program & Fund (the Program). The Program will be administered by the Delaware Health Care Commission in order to provide reinsurance to health insurance carriers that offer individual health benefit plans in Delaware. The Program will be funded with passthrough funds received from the federal government under the Affordable Care Act, funds provided by the Federal Government for reinsurance, and through a 2.75% annual assessment based on insurance carriers premium tax liability.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 16 And 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Insurance Individual Market Stabilization Reinsurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-13 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |