DE HB189 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Advanced Wireless Infrastructure Investment Act creates a new Chapter 16 of Title 17 that will accelerate investment in mobile broadband infrastructure and ready the State for the next wave of economic development in the digital economy. In recognition of the shift from landline to wireless communications, the Act authorizes wireless providers access to the States rights of way and establishes a Statewide policy for deployment of small wireless cells to meet the growing demand for wireless services which provide Delaware citizens with access to advanced technology, information and 911 services.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-09 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 5 Favorable | |
2017-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |